1ST CROWTHORNE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.06k £19.30k £10.66k £12.88k £20.76k
Total expenditure £12.14k £14.56k £7.63k £7.56k £7.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A