Financial history 1ST HARWELL (ST. MATTHEW'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 300497
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £58.38k £42.23k £74.87k £27.32k £82.72k
Total expenditure £62.17k £44.28k £70.18k £22.92k £86.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.47k £53.55k