Accounts and annual returns CARNON DOWNS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 17 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window