QUINTRELL DOWNS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2020 27 March 2021 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2019 02 March 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2018 02 March 2020 389 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2017 14 February 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2016 14 February 2018 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2016 Not Required