QUINTRELL DOWNS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300529
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
07/04/2016 07/04/2017 07/04/2018 07/04/2019 07/04/2020
Total gross income £8.44k £6.38k £8.91k £8.50k £7.91k