PARISH HALL ST KEW

Charity number: 300622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £7.67k £17.17k £7.88k £5.55k £5.99k
Total expenditure £3.11k £20.35k £8.06k £5.30k £4.28k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A