CHALFONT ST PETER GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 300661
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 March 2021 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 01 February 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 April 2019 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required