Financial history EAST ALLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £5.78k £4.40k £5.40k £20.13k £6.69k
Total expenditure £7.11k £5.55k £5.13k £19.27k £5.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £13.00k N/A