3RD ST BUDEAUX SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 301017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.71k £2.69k £3.01k £7.16k £1.98k
Total expenditure £1.58k £2.41k £2.45k £8.15k £4.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A