Accounts and annual returns DEVON COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 301073
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window