Accounts and annual returns EAST DEVON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 301078
Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 98 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 November 2024 295 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required