1ST SHELFORDS AND STAPLEFORD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 301093
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)