Trustees THE COMRADES HALL
Charity number: 301110

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Persey | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Chittenden | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne Hickey | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Dyke | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Loraine Isherwood Cooper | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christine Miller | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tim Frampton | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Farley | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Maguire | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ruth stevens | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
christopher edgerley | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
megan jones | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
TERRY CLARKE | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOOKINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.