GILLINGHAM SWIMMING BATH

Charity number: 301131
Charity reporting is overdue by 1815 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £45.01k £58.75k £102.68k £123.67k £0
Total expenditure £45.01k £58.75k £102.68k £123.67k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A