OAKDALE PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 301166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANN JOHNSON Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Andrew Michael Lewis Trustee 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Johanna Barton Trustee 30 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
SUSAN KATHRYN COLBORNE Trustee 15 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Anne-Marie Seraphin Trustee 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
THOMAS LOCK Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Paul Griffin Trustee 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Nigel Seraphin Trustee 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
JACQUELINE LINDA MOORE Trustee 15 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
PAMELA CLARK Trustee 27 October 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Michelle Cobley Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
Caroline West Trustee 30 April 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Christine Ann Griffin Trustee 15 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
Rev Penelope Marynice Draper Chair 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKDALE ST.GEORGE, POOLE Received: On time
POOLE-WAU PARTNERSHIP CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time