CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £63.70k £59.81k £90.24k £76.58k £61.06k
Total expenditure £58.77k £56.39k £104.54k £98.76k £58.37k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £28.65k