CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annie Humphrey Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Charles Porth Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Joan Lockett Trustee 26 March 2014
CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM PLAYING FIELDS Received: On time
DAVID FROST Trustee None on record
Anne Turner Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
Kenny Bentham Trustee 30 October 2017
CHARITY KNOWN AS SOUTH WOODHAM PLAYING FIELDS Received: On time
IAN ROBERTS Trustee None on record
Robert Tyas Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
CAROL LINGHAM Trustee None on record
Daniel Stephenson Trustee 25 March 2015 None on record
Ivan Lambert Trustee 11 September 2017
SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS MALE VOICE CHOIR Received: On time
Tory Melhuish Chair 27 March 2019 None on record
Mark Hatcher Trustee 27 March 2019 None on record
Danny Buckle Trustee 12 September 2019 None on record
Clive Alexander Trustee 23 June 2021 None on record
SAM COLEY Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record