THE NOTTAGE MARITIME INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Instruction by qualified persons, using Royal Yachting Association course materials, in teaching leisure sailors the theory of navigation, radio procedure and diesel engine maintenance. To hold courses on practical small wooden boat building. To maintain property at The Quay in Wivenhoe Essex as a base for the above and to maintain a small nautical library and museum.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 27 October 1967: Standard registration
- THE NOTTAGE MARITIME INSTITUTE (Working name)
- THE NOTTAGE INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bernard John Hetherington | Chair | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Mark Bielecki | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Blaxill | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Leslie Lewis | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.33k | £28.07k | £29.83k | £29.23k | £33.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.12k | £16.83k | £28.61k | £34.14k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.10k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 19 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: 1) THE SCIENCE OF MARITIME NAVIGATION; AND 2) SCIENCES AND SKILLS RELATING TO THE CONSTRUCTION, MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF BOATS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Nottage Maritime Institute
The Quay
Wivenhoe
COLCHESTER
CO7 9BX
- Phone:
- 01206823835
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window