BISHOPS CLEEVE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MANAGEMENT OF BISHOP'S CLEEVE VILLAGE HALL - A 15TH CENTURY GRADE II LISTED TITHE BARN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £585 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 October 1962: Standard registration
- BISHOPS CLEEVE TITHE BARN (Working name)
- BISHOPS CLEEVE TYTHE BARN (Working name)
- BISHOP'S CLEEVE VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Arthur Simon Waller | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Michael Green | Trustee | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Lea | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Fisher | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judith Gibbins OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.18k | £38.72k | £45.35k | £74.14k | £82.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.31k | £41.10k | £45.36k | £61.47k | £58.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £585 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | £3.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 NOVEMBER 1953 AS AMENDED 02 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BISHOP'S CLEEVE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
TITHE BARN
CHELTENHAM ROAD
BISHOPS CLEEVE
CHELTENHAM
GL52 8LU
- Phone:
- 01242678271
- Email:
- admin@cleevetithebarn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window