Financial history BLAKENEY AND DISTRICT RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 301468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £11.33k £11.05k £12.15k £12.44k £14.50k
Total expenditure £9.43k £6.73k £9.18k £10.16k £8.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k