CINDERFORD WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 301498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 July 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 10 October 2016 On time Download