Trustees REDMARLEY VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 301604

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANNE MICHELE JONES | Chair | 16 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Nicholas Jones | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Berrington | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophy Darlow | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER GERALD CONDON MA FCA | Trustee | 07 November 2003 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.