BROAD PLAIN - WORKING WITH YOUNG PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PRIMARILY AN INFORMAL SETTING THROUGH A STRUCTURED PROGRAMME OF DISCUSSION, SPORTS AND ACTIVITIES. THE CLUB STRIVES FOR HIGH STANDARDS OF BEHAVIOUR, ENCOURAGING SELF DISCIPLINE IN A CARING ENVIRONMENT. IN THIS ENVIRONMENT MEMBERS CAN BROADEN THEIR HORIZONS, BE CHALLENGED ABOURT THEIR ATTITUDES AND UNDERTAKE NEW EXPERIENCES TO ASSIST WITH THEIR SOCIAL AWARENESS AND DEVELOPMENT. THE CLUB PROVIDES SU
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bristol City
Governance
- 20 April 1964: Standard registration
- BROAD PLAIN BOYS CLUB (Working name)
- BROAD PLAIN LADS' CLUB (Previous name)
- BROAD PLAIN LADS' CLUB: (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lee Williams | Trustee | 24 January 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
DAWN HARVEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ANTHONY FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JAMES MC ARTHUR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.92k | £12.28k | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.30k | £18.25k | £1 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 April 2023 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10 JUNE 1903 AND CONSTITUTION AMENDED 19 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 2020 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
The aim of the Club is to advance in life and help and educate people aged up to and including the age of 25 years by providing such people access to a range of learning opportunities and challenging experiences (including leisure time activities) which promote their personal education and social development
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Young Bristol
The Station
Silver Street
Bristol
BS1 2AG
- Phone:
- 01179292513
- Email:
- dennismbe@riversideyp.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window