Accounts and annual returns MINA ROAD PARK

Charity number: 301696
Charity reporting is overdue by 865 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 500 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 500 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 865 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 865 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required