COPYTHORNE PARISH HALL

Charity number: 301790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £30.27k £35.44k £39.04k £33.13k £27.68k
Total expenditure £26.52k £29.36k £35.95k £29.77k £44.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.57k