EAST MEON RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recreation Ground for the village
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Downer | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sillence | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Trudie Lang | Trustee | 22 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Round | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Andrew Ritchie | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tom William John Tyrwhitt-Drake | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW ATKINSON | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
EAST MEON PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee | 19 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ridgeon | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DAVENPORT | Trustee | 09 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.66k | £1.42k | £1.11k | £834 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.66k | £1.42k | £1.11k | £834 | £1.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31 OCTOBER 1958
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST MEON
Contact information
- Address:
-
East Meon Parish Council
PO Box 280
PETERSFIELD
GU32 9FZ
- Phone:
- 07913 559579
- Email:
- properofficerempc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window