CHARITY CONSISTING OF CERTAIN TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH PORTSEA ROTARY YOUTH CLUB

Charity number: 301922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 06 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 12 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 14 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required