Accounts and annual returns SHERBORNE ST JOHN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301945
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 March 2022 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 07 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required