Trustees SHERBORNE ST JOHN VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 301945
Charity reporting is up to date (140 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PAUL TEMPLE Chair 01 January 2015
None on record
Tracey Jeram Trustee 10 January 2016
None on record
Shawna Marie Campbell Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
Debra Morgan Trustee 01 January 2015
None on record
Hilary Ann Andrews Trustee 01 September 2014
None on record
Brian Mitchison Trustee 12 September 2013
None on record