Accounts and annual returns THRUXTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301969
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 12 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 25 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 19 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window