Accounts and annual returns THE COLONEL JENKINS MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 301985
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2021 363 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required