CHELMSFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 302033
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £116.44k £97.59k £97.36k £99.64k £10.52k
Total expenditure £120.27k £111.20k £105.89k £109.25k £22.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A