SOUTHMINSTER AND MAYLANDSEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 09 August 1966: Standard registration
- THE SCOUTS (Working name)
- 1ST SOUTHMINSTER BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 1ST SOUTHMINSTER SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Reed | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE HAWKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE RODNEY BUNDY | Trustee |
|
||||||
RUPERT KILLICK | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOHN PAUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MERLE BUNDY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.82k | £23.14k | £5.38k | £5.29k | £5.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.88k | £11.28k | £5.65k | £16.16k | £5.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 March 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 401 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 20 APRIL 1966 ON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 1955
Charitable objects
SOUTHMINSTER AND MAYLANDSEA SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
SOUTHMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Queen Street
SOUTHMINSTER
Essex
Southminster
CM0 7BB
- Phone:
- 07776258688
- Email:
- kreed499@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window