CHADWELL - ST-MARY SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP

Charity number: 302084
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £20.25k £23.09k £24.85k £22.59k £19.31k
Total expenditure £25.25k £19.72k £21.86k £16.84k £25.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A