Chadwell St Mary Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting and Guiding for Young people and children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Thurrock
Governance
- 28 March 1963: Standard registration
- 2ND CHADWELL ST MARY GROUP BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- 2ND CHADWELL ST MARY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- CHADWELL - ST-MARY SCOUT AND GUIDE GROUP (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Francis Abbott | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Spurgeon | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Spurgeon | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ruth Abbott | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD WHITTAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.31k | £64.86k | £18.84k | £15.93k | £25.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.72k | £7.62k | £12.24k | £62.56k | £18.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £59.44k | £8.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 February 2023 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26 JANUARY 1961 as amended on 14 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE 2ND CHADWELL ST MARY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
CHADWELL-ST-MARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Maycroft Avenue
GRAYS
Essex
RM17 6AN
- Phone:
- 01375401464
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window