Financial history 1ST OCKENDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302086
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £30.72k £40.73k £28.83k £36.33k £29.90k
Total expenditure £34.75k £38.17k £27.05k £41.50k £7.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £27.18k