STIFFORD SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We currently have around 100 members from six to fifteen years of age drawn from the local area. With membership open to all irrespective of sex, ethnicity, faith, or disability. Our aim is; To promote the development of young people to achieve their full potential, physically, intellectually, socially, spiritually, and to become responsible citizens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Thurrock
Governance
- 12 February 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST STIFFORD CLAYS BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HUBBARD | Chair | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Rowe | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
GLEN WILLIS | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN ROWE | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DENISE TUFFEE | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN DODSON | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASHLEY KEMPSTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOANNE PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JOHN MERRITT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.84k | £14.76k | £27.22k | £39.44k | £31.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.72k | £10.72k | £17.57k | £34.69k | £34.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £22.94k | £3.73k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 February 2023 | 114 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 March 2022 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 December 2020 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 9 JANUARY 1958 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
STIFFORD SEA SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
STIFFORD CLAYS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Aluric Close
GRAYS
Essex
RM16 4NB
- Phone:
- 07966027570
- Email:
- akelaorca@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window