Trustees GLOUCESTER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 302111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael John Seamarks | Chair | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Mark Large | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Duncan Trott | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fraiser James Thomas | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Connie Arabel Elizabeth Plant | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Joy Hawkins | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Hughes | Trustee | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HAWKINS | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Harris | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Turner | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Edwards | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALAN FAULKNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.