Trustees 11TH GLOUCESTER (HUCCLECOTE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302112
Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Selena Nield | Chair | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Hall | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Hughes | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Thomas | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gaulton | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah BRADLEY | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John David Morris | Trustee | 22 January 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.