2ND COWES (ST MARY'S) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.56k £9.94k £13.74k £12.22k £8.66k
Total expenditure £15.62k £7.80k £10.29k £10.11k £12.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A