Accounts and annual returns 44TH BRISTOL (WHITE TREE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required