Financial history 44TH BRISTOL (WHITE TREE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302160
Charity reporting is up to date (77 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.68k £30.68k £36.70k £27.40k £65.09k
Total expenditure £24.03k £15.92k £25.27k £28.74k £35.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.43k £10.67k N/A N/A