Financial history 227TH BRISTOL (ST PETER'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302185
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.40k £11.86k £14.66k £32.16k £22.93k
Total expenditure £7.49k £14.41k £13.99k £18.19k £12.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £19.43k £10.67k