Trustees 227TH BRISTOL (ST PETER'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302185
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Brown Trustee 16 January 2023
None on record
Gill Dirdal Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Andrew Turner Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Katie Cruickshank Trustee 28 November 2016
None on record
Christopher Tothill Trustee 28 November 2016
None on record
Alistair James Robinson Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record
Lynne Alison Donald Trustee 06 March 2014
None on record