14th Aldershot Pegasus Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Scout Association is to promote the physical, intellectual, social and spiritual development of young people, as individuals, responsible citizens and members of their local, national and international communities. This is achieved by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the scout promise and law and guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 December 1963: Standard registration
- 14TH ALDERSHOT BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- 14TH ALDERSHOT SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cesar Freschi | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Hewitson | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Bazen | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hughes | Trustee | 16 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KIERNAN MICHAEL LANE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.76k | £23.23k | £24.92k | £24.35k | £28.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.74k | £8.47k | £21.49k | £26.84k | £28.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.91k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
14TH ALDERSHOT BOY SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
ALDERSHOT AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mantle Hall
72 North Lane
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU12 4QG
- Phone:
- 01252317471
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window