14TH EASTLEIGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302230
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £17.87k £16.81k £19.85k £25.64k £58.44k
Total expenditure £15.23k £16.40k £16.81k £28.89k £25.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A