14TH EASTLEIGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302230
Charity reporting is up to date (152 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sharon Louise Clark Trustee 27 September 2003 None on record
DOUGLAS SMITH Trustee
EASTLEIGH DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: 20 days late
Adam John Edwards Trustee 01 January 2015 None on record
IAN COLE Trustee 01 August 1985 None on record
CHRISTINE Elizabeth COLE Chair None on record
ANTHONY COLE Trustee None on record
Adrian Charles Clark Trustee 08 April 2010 None on record
Gregory Alexander Richard Walker Trustee 23 November 2016 None on record
Julia Gavin Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record