Financial history 6TH GOSPORT (ROWNER) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £28.39k £35.71k £31.94k £28.95k £46.47k
Total expenditure £22.79k £29.74k £40.11k £18.02k £35.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £18.00k £18.44k