1ST HORNDEAN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 302250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.99k £21.84k £18.26k £14.06k £28.71k
Total expenditure £11.32k £20.19k £14.29k £10.74k £13.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £4.56k £780 £2.87k £11.87k