Accounts and annual returns 19TH THORNHILL (ITCHEN NORTH DIVISION) - GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS

Charity number: 302310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 February 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 January 2022 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required